This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/10/2023 at 05:54:34 (UTC).

LANDMARK AT DORAL HOMEOWNERS ASSN INC VS DIDIMO ANTONIO BRACHO URDANETA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 LANDMARK AT DORAL HOMEOWNERS ASSN INC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against DIDIMO ANTONIO BRACHO URDANETA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Landmark At Doral Homeowners Assn Inc

Defendants

Bracho Urdaneta, Didimo Antonio

Bracho Primera, Ana Delia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brough, David L.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/05/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/05/2023 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

01/05/2023 - Lis Pendens

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/09/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Voluntary Dismissal

01/24/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Bracho Primera Ana Delia

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Bracho Primera Ana Delia

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Bracho Urdaneta Didimo Antonio

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
01/06/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090631AMT PAID:$307.50NAME:BROUGH, DAVID L.BROUGH, CHADROW, & LEVINE P.A. 2149 N COMMERCE PKWFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33326-3238COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.002102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.502142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$307.50RECEIPT DATE:01/06/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33533:2477; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $3911.42

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less