This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/09/2022 at 15:18:30 (UTC).

LAKEWOOD RANCH CHIROPRACTIC INC VS FARMERS INS EXCHANGE

Case Summary

On 01/17/2022 LAKEWOOD RANCH CHIROPRACTIC INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FARMERS INS EXCHANGE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic Inc

Assignor

Cashman, Deborah

Defendant

Farmers Ins Exchange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

Defendant Attorney

Mears, Melissa A, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/17/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/17/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/18/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Request for Production

02/07/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/07/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

02/07/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

02/07/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

02/07/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Service of Process

02/18/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

02/23/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Dismiss

03/08/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

03/08/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

Order Setting CM Deadline

03/11/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Farmers Ins Exchange

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: REQUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Farmers Ins Exchange

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000372AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2022REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020363AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:01/19/2022REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKEWOOD RANCH CHIROPRACTIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEARS, MELISSA AUDREEN