This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/25/2023 at 08:11:11 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC VS ANGEL TORRES ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANGEL TORRES. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc

Defendants

Torres, Angel

Garcia, Maria Luisa

Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Asset Acceptance Llc

Cach Llc

Capital One Bank Usa NA

Cascade Capital Llc

Cavalry Spv I Llc

City Of Homestead

City Of Miami

Keeler, Byron Edward

Crown Asset Management Llc

Dade County Federal Credit Union

Garcia, Douglas M

Epc Holdings Lp

Equable Ascent Financial Llc

Flagler West Corporate Center Llc

Ford Motor Credit Company

Galaxy Portfolios Llc

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Sara Beth

Defendant Attorneys

Gross-Rasco, Deanna D.

Kligler, Joshua C, ESQ

Other Attorneys

Gillman, Henry N

Sean Bermudez

Kopf, Jennifer Lynn

 

Court Documents

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

05/05/2022 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Lis Pendens

05/06/2022 - Lis Pendens

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

05/05/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/05/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Email Notice:

05/05/2022 - Email Notice:

Notice of Default Not Entered-Unknown Person(s)

10/24/2023 - Notice of Default Not Entered-Unknown Person(s)

Notice of Default Not Entered

10/23/2023 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Notice of Default Not Entered

10/23/2023 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Notice of Default Not Entered

10/23/2023 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Default

10/23/2023 - Default

Motion for Default

10/18/2023 - Motion for Default

Notice of Hearing-

09/15/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

08/25/2023 - Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

Motion for Default

08/25/2023 - Motion for Default

Default

08/21/2023 - Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

08/21/2023 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Motion for Default

08/17/2023 - Motion for Default

Lis Pendens

02/08/2023 - Lis Pendens

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered-Unknown Person(s); Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Midland Funding Llc Successor To Bank Of America N; Midland Funding Llc Successor To Citibank

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Capital One Bank Usa NA; Equable Ascent Financial Llc; Ford Motor Credit Company; Td Bank Usa Na; Wachovia Bank NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Keeler Byron Edward; Duarte Selmira C; Conserva Sonia

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cascade Capital Llc; Crown Asset Management Llc; Midland Funding Llc; Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee Of Synchrony

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: OCTOBER 18, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
79 More Docket Entries
05/16/2022

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2022

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc; Torres Angel; Garcia MariaLuisa; Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company; Asset Acceptance Llc; Cach Llc; Capital One Bank Usa NA; Cascade Capital Llc; Cavalry Spv I Llc; City Of Homestead; City Of Miami; Keeler Byron Edward; Crown Asset Management Llc; Dade County Federal Credit Union; Garcia Douglas M; Epc Holdings Lp; Equable Ascent Financial Llc; Flagler West Corporate Center Llc; Ford Motor Credit Company; Galaxy Portfolios Llc; J&J Sports Productions Inc; Jetstream Federal Credit Union; Lvnv Funding Llc; Miami-Dade County A Political Subdivision Of The S; Midland Funding Llc; Midland Funding Llc Successor To Bank Of America N; Midland Funding Llc Successor To Citibank; Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee Of Synchrony; Progressive American Insurance Company; Riviera Preparatory School Holdings Llc; Duarte Selmira C; Conserva Sonia; State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co Allen Del Noda; State Farm

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050050AMT PAID:$1,024.00NAME:COLLINS, SARA BETHMCCALLA RAYMER PIERCE, LLC 225 E ROBINSON ST SUITEORLANDO FL 32801-4326COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$105.00$105.003142-RECORDING FEE1$8.00$8.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,024.00RECEIPT DATE:05/07/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33177:4798; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MRSERVICE@MCCALLA.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less