This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/09/2020 at 01:55:36 (UTC).

LAGO CLUB APARTMENTS, LLC VS. GUSTAVO ALEJANDRO YABRUDY DIAZ GRANADOS

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 LAGO CLUB APARTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUSTAVO ALEJANDRO YABRUDY DIAZ GRANADOS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lago Club Apartments, LLC

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

Diaz Granados, Gustavo Alejandro Yabrudy

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

03/10/2020 - Service Returned

Default

03/05/2020 - Default

Affidavit as to Costs

03/03/2020 - Affidavit as to Costs

Motion for Default Judgment

03/03/2020 - Motion for Default Judgment

Motion for Default

03/03/2020 - Motion for Default

Affidavit of Non-Payment

03/03/2020 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Service Returned

02/28/2020 - Service Returned

Complaint

02/13/2020 - Complaint

Affidavit of:

02/13/2020 - Affidavit of:

Non-Military Affidavit

02/13/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Diaz Granados Gustavo Alejandro Yabrudy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Non-Payment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2070005AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/25/2020 REGISTER#:207CASHIER:MATTIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Diaz Granados Gustavo Alejandro Yabrudy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580260AMT PAID:$185.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/14/2020 REGISTER#:358CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DESIGNATING AUTHORITY TO PROPERTY MANAGERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.