This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/21/2022 at 05:38:45 (UTC).

L C M IMAGING INC VS ASSURANCEAMERICA INS CO

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 L C M IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASSURANCEAMERICA INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

L C M Imaging Inc

Advanced Diagnostic Group

Assignor

Williams, Markia

Defendant

Assuranceamerica Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/21/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/21/2022 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

01/21/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

01/21/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

01/21/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

01/21/2022 - Notice of Appearance

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/09/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

02/16/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice:

03/03/2022 - Notice:

Voluntary Dismissal

03/14/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

03/14/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Assuranceamerica Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Assuranceamerica Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030087AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/10/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Assuranceamerica Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2960142AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030MIAMI FL 33137-3232COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:01/22/2022REGISTER#:296CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1119.78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LCM IMAGING, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Advanced Diagnostic Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Estevez, Marisol