This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/09/2020 at 15:53:51 (UTC).

KRYSTLE O'BRIEN VS THERA-PRO CARE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 KRYSTLE O'BRIEN filed an Other lawsuit against THERA-PRO CARE LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

O'Brien, Krystle

Defendants

Paredes, Dinaibys

Thera-Pro Care LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Perera, Jorge F.

Brody M Shulman Esq

Defendant Attorney

Quinon, Jose M

 

Court Documents

Order:

10/10/2019 - Order:

AgreedOrder

10/07/2019 - AgreedOrder

Notice of Interrogatory

07/17/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response to Motion

07/01/2019 - Response to Motion

Notice of Appearance

05/17/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Dismiss

05/17/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Email Notice:

05/17/2019 - Email Notice:

Service Returned

05/02/2019 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/02/2019 - Service Returned

Notice of Hearing-

09/10/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion:

09/09/2019 - Motion:

Request for Production

09/06/2019 - Request for Production

Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

07/02/2019 - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

Motion:

06/19/2019 - Motion:

Notice of Hearing-

06/04/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Response:

05/31/2019 - Response:

Notice of Appearance

05/17/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Civil Cover

04/09/2019 - Civil Cover

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketMotion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Brody M Shulman Esq; O'Brien Krystle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ENTRY OF CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: JQUINON@QUINONLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Quinon Jose M; Thera-Pro Care LLC; Paredes Dinaibys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2160056AMT PAID:$20.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$100.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/29/2019 REGISTER#:216CASHIER:MARIAGU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Thera-Pro Care LLC; Paredes Dinaibys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3430219AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:PERERA, JORGE F. PERERA LAW GROUP, P.A. 13903 NW 67TH AVE, STE 330 MIAMI LAKES FL 33014 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING AC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less