This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/20/2021 at 03:47:25 (UTC).

KENDALL ACRES WEST CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. VS CECILIA GUERRA ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 KENDALL ACRES WEST CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CECILIA GUERRA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kendall Acres West Condominium Association, Inc.

Defendants

Guerra, Cecilia

Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (The)

U.S. HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELPOMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart J Nunez (esq)

 

Court Documents

Default

10/18/2021 - Default

Order of Default

10/15/2021 - Order of Default

Motion for Default

10/15/2021 - Motion for Default

Motion for Default

10/15/2021 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

10/15/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Service Return for Unknown Party

09/14/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Summons Returned - No Service

09/14/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

09/14/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

09/14/2021 - Service Returned

Lis Pendens

08/30/2021 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

08/25/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/25/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Guerra Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: JOHN DOE UNKNOWN TENANT - NON-SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Guerra Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Guerra Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (The)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: 20 DAY SUMMONS DAY ISSUED JOHN DOE AS TENANT IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CECILIA GUERRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2480014AMT PAID:$40.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE4$10.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$40.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/31/2021 REGISTER#:248CASHIER:EMASSEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Guerra Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020094AMT PAID:$9.00 NAME:STUART J NUNEZ (ESQ) 10691 N KENDALL DR STE 206 MIAMI FL 33176-1595 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$9.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/31/2021 REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32718:3530; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990141AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:STUART J NUNEZ (ESQ) 10691 N KENDALL DR STE 206 MIAMI FL 33176-1595 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/26/2021 REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of Housing and Urban Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stuart J Nunez (esq)