This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/18/2023 at 19:58:14 (UTC).

KAYLEES CHIROPRACTIC AAO CYNTHIA GILYARD VS PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORP

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 KAYLEES CHIROPRACTIC AAO CYNTHIA GILYARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kaylees Chiropractic Aao Cynthia Gilyard

Defendant

Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Poulopoulos, Theophilos G

Defendant Attorney

Klassman, Robert

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/18/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/18/2022 - Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

11/18/2022 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

11/18/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

11/18/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

11/18/2022 - Request for Admissions

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

11/28/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

12/05/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

12/15/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

12/15/2022 - Email Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140369AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:POULOPOULOS, THEOPHILOS G9130 S DADELAND BLVD STE 1902MIAMI FL 33156-7858COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/30/2022REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100636AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:POULOPOULOS, THEOPHILOS G9130 S DADELAND BLVD STE 1902MIAMI FL 33156-7858COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:11/23/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Klassman, Robert