This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/13/2020 at 17:26:29 (UTC).

KARIM KABIRUDIN VS LORENA HOLGUIN

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 KARIM KABIRUDIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LORENA HOLGUIN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kabirudin, Karim

Defendant

Holguin, Lorena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fabrikant, Kevin H.

Fabrikant, Kevin H., ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Montes, Alix J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/12/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Memorandum of Disposition

07/16/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Letter of Correspondence

06/21/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Amended Complaint

06/12/2019 - Amended Complaint

Request for Production

05/08/2019 - Request for Production

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

05/02/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Hearing-

03/26/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Extension of Time

03/12/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Complaint

02/01/2019 - Complaint

Amended Notice

12/16/2019 - Amended Notice

Memorandum of Disposition

12/05/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion to Withdraw

12/03/2019 - Motion to Withdraw

Order:

12/03/2019 - Order:

Notice of Unavailability/absence

11/13/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Hearing-

11/19/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Contempt

11/12/2019 - Motion for Contempt

Notice of Hearing-

08/20/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Compel

08/12/2019 - Motion to Compel

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT AND SANCTIONS AGAINST THE DEFENDANT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT ORDER DATED SEPTEMBER 10, 2019 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER ANSWER AND MOTION TO WAIVE DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS||PLAINTIFFS MOTION FO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Emergency Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Withdraw; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230020AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$42.50 RECEIPT DATE:02/05/2019 REGISTER#:323CASHIER:MARIAGU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Holguin Lorena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480119AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:FABRIKANT, KEVIN H. 7777 DAVIE ROAD EXT STE 100A HOLLYWOOD FL 33024-2514 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: 15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.