This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/29/2021 at 16:22:02 (UTC).

K & K FARM SERVICES INC VS GASTON MARQUEVICH

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 K K FARM SERVICES INC filed an Other lawsuit against GASTON MARQUEVICH. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

K & K Farm Services Inc

Defendant

Marquevich, Gaston

Garnishees

City National Bank

Bank Of America Corporation

Northern Trust Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hyatt, Joel W

Defendant Attorney

Matthew S Sarelson Esq

 

Court Documents

AgreedOrder

10/21/2021 - AgreedOrder

Motion:

10/20/2021 - Motion:

AgreedOrder

09/29/2021 - AgreedOrder

Notice:

09/29/2021 - Notice:

Response to Motion

09/29/2021 - Response to Motion

Emergency Motion

09/28/2021 - Emergency Motion

Emergency Motion

09/28/2021 - Emergency Motion

Notice of Hearing-

09/28/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Answer of Garnishee

09/27/2021 - Answer of Garnishee

Service Returned

09/10/2021 - Service Returned

Notice:

09/07/2021 - Notice:

Motion for Garnishment

08/23/2021 - Motion for Garnishment

Answer of Garnishee

08/17/2021 - Answer of Garnishee

Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed

08/09/2021 - Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed

Returned Mail

08/06/2021 - Returned Mail

Notice of Appearance

08/04/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed

08/02/2021 - Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed

Notice:

07/30/2021 - Notice:

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDING THE SEPTEMBER 29,2021 AGREED ORDER UNFREEZING CERTAIN ACCOUNTS AT NORTHERN TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION TO UNFREEZE BANK ACCOUNTS (SET BY COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING DEFENDANTSSEPTEMBER 28, 2021 EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION TO UNFREEZE ACCOUNTS AT NORTHERN TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF GARNISHMENT NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Emergency Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO UNFREEZE ACCOUNTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Emergency Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO UNFREEZE ACCOUNTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: SPECIAL SET HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 15 MINS ON 09-30-2021 @ 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Garnishment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: eWrit of Garnishment (Confidential) RECEIVED; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: eWrit of Garnishment (Confidential) RECEIVED; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Registered Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE 389 906 383 US (GASTON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Copy of Notice and Judgment Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Recording of Foreign Judgment; Book/Page: 32510:708; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170002AMT PAID:$531.20COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$62.50$62.503154-REGISTERED MAIL (11$25.70$25.703133-NOTICE OF RECORDIN1$42.00$42.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$531.20RECEIPT DATE:05/12/2021REGISTER#:217CASHIER:FERGUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Recorded Document; Book/Page: 32504:457; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Foreign Judgment Filed; Book/Page: 32504:526; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City National Bank of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where The Northern Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew S Sarelson Esq