This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/09/2020 at 15:51:06 (UTC).

JUSTINE JOHNSON VS FLOWERS BAKING CO. OF MIAMI, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 JUSTINE JOHNSON filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against FLOWERS BAKING CO OF MIAMI, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, JUSTINE

Defendant

FLOWERS BAKING CO. OF MIAMI, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zandro Palma

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/15/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/15/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover

01/15/2020 - Civil Cover

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/16/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/17/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

02/01/2020 - Service Returned

Service Returned

02/03/2020 - Service Returned

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

02/27/2020 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Book/Page: 31839:630; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: FLOWERS BAKING CO. OF MIAMI LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450210AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:ZANDRO PALMA 9100 S DADELAND BLVD STE 1500 MIAMI FL 33156-7816 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580258AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:ZANDRO PALMA 9100 S DADELAND BLVD STE 1500 MIAMI FL 33156-7816 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Flowers Baking Co. of Miami, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zandro Palma