This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/02/2021 at 10:22:46 (UTC).

JUAN MIGUEL COLUMNA VS U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 JUAN MIGUEL COLUMNA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against U S SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Columna, Juan Miguel

Defendants

U.S. Security Associates, Inc.

ALLIED UNIVERSAL SECURITY SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clancy, Ryan M., ESQ

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/10/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

06/09/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/09/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: U.S. Security Associates Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640190AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:CLANCY, RYAN M., ESQ 801 BRICKELL AVENUE 8TH FLOOR MIAMI FL 33131 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/15/2021 REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650043AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:CLANCY, RYAN M., ESQ 801 BRICKELL AVENUE 8TH FLOOR MIAMI FL 33131 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/11/2021 REGISTER#:265CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allied Universal Security Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN CLANCY