This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/30/2020 at 00:24:41 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ROBERTO DE LEON ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROBERTO DE LEON. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

De Leon, Linda

DE LEON, ROBERT

DE LEON, ROBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fishman, Barry S

Friedlander, Amanda, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process

06/11/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Order Setting Case Management Conference

06/05/2020 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Motion for Summary Judgment

03/11/2020 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Default

02/11/2020 - Default

Motion for Default

02/07/2020 - Motion for Default

Notice of Filing:

01/21/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice:

01/21/2020 - Notice:

Summons Returned - No Service

12/31/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

12/31/2019 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/31/2019 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

12/31/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Lis Pendens

11/18/2019 - Lis Pendens

Notice of Filing:

11/18/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

11/18/2019 - Lis Pendens

Notice:

11/18/2019 - Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

11/18/2019 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover

11/18/2019 - Civil Cover

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Case Management Conference; Hearing Code: CMC; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Conference; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Case Management Conference; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Friedlander Amanda ESQ; JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNT DUE & OWING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DE LEON ROBERTO; De Leon Linda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2040063AMT PAID:$40.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE4$10.00$40.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$40.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/22/2019 REGISTER#:204CASHIER:ANDYM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: DE LEON ROBERTO; De Leon Linda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3600359AMT PAID:$1,915.00 NAME:FISHMAN, BARRY S 2424 N FEDERAL HWY STE 360 BOCA RATON FL 33431-7781 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1 $1,906.00 $1,906.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31732:214; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF PREVIOUS CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.