This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/01/2022 at 14:39:12 (UTC).

J.P. MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP. VS MIRASIL LLC., A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 J P MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MIRASIL LLC , A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp.

Defendants

MIRASIL LLC., A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SILVA, NELSON O

LE PARC AT BRICKELL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Duggar, Esq.

 

Court Documents

Motion:

07/20/2022 - Motion:

Lis Pendens

07/21/2022 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

07/20/2022 - Complaint

Certificate of Possession of Note

07/20/2022 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/20/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

08/22/2022 - Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

Service Return for Unknown Party

08/19/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/18/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Service Returned

08/18/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/18/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/18/2022 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

08/18/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13. Parties: MIRASIL LLC. A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010269AMT PAID:$1,915.00NAME:JASON DUGGAR, ESQ.GHIDOTTI BERGER LLP 1031 N MIAMI BEACH BLVDNORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33162COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,915.00RECEIPT DATE:07/22/2022REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33301:3531; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ENFORCE ASSIGNMENT OF RENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duggar, Jason