Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/20/2020 at 21:32:06 (UTC).

JOSE M. VAZQUEZ VS ANIMAL SERVICES

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 JOSE M VAZQUEZ filed an Other lawsuit against ANIMAL SERVICES. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

Vazquez, Jose M.

Appellee

Animal Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

Price-Williams, Abigail

 

Court Documents

Letter of Correspondence

05/21/2020 - Letter of Correspondence

Order of Dismissal

04/22/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Order to Show Cause

03/25/2020 - Order to Show Cause

Motion for Extension of Time for Initial Brief

02/24/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time for Initial Brief

Order Granting Extension for Initial Brief

02/24/2020 - Order Granting Extension for Initial Brief

Order to Show Cause

02/10/2020 - Order to Show Cause

Record on Appeal.

01/06/2020 - Record on Appeal.

Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

12/19/2019 - Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

Text

12/18/2019 - Text

Notice of Administrative Appeal

12/17/2019 - Notice of Administrative Appeal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO JUDGE TRAWICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31910:3541; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR FAILURE TO FILE INITIAL BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Show Cause; Event Type: Event; Comments: WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE INITIAL BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time for Initial Brief; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Granting Extension for Initial Brief; Event Type: Event; Comments: DUE MARCH 22, 2020 Due Date:03/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Show Cause; Event Type: Event; Comments: WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE INITIAL BRIEF Due Date:02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record Completed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record on Appeal.; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: (STATEMENT OF COSTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3300001AMT PAID:$281.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3063-COUNTY APPEAL-AP/A1$281.00$281.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$281.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/17/2019 REGISTER#:330CASHIER:HLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Estimated Cost Received; Event Type: Event; Comments: $281.00 FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Administrative Appeal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANIMAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Price-Williams, Abigail