This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/16/2021 at 01:25:08 (UTC).

JOSE DIAZ VS MIGUEL TRIANA ALVAREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 JOSE DIAZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MIGUEL TRIANA ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diaz, Jose

Defendants

Triana Alvarez, Miguel

Adonel Equipment Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge J Garcia

 

Court Documents

Request for Admissions

10/13/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

10/13/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

10/13/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/05/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/01/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Affidavit of Service

09/16/2021 - Affidavit of Service

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/26/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/26/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

08/25/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/25/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Production

08/24/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

08/24/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

08/24/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

08/24/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

08/24/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

08/24/2021 - Request for Admissions

Complaint

08/24/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/24/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Triana Alvarez Miguel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Adonel Equipment Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Adonel Equipment Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Triana Alvarez Miguel

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jorge J Garcia