This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/13/2021 at 02:55:14 (UTC).

JORGE LABRADA VS MARTHA M. SMITH

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 JORGE LABRADA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTHA M SMITH. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LABRADA, JORGE

Defendant

SMITH, MARTHA M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reyes, Adrian

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

07/22/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order to Serve Defendant

07/07/2021 - Order to Serve Defendant

Complaint

03/12/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/12/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32643:2739; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE Parties: SMITH MARTHA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Serve Defendant; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560184AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:REYES, ADRIAN 2300 WEST 84TH STREET SUITE 302 HIALEAH FL 33016-5773 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/16/2021 REGISTER#:256CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reyes, Adrian