This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/25/2023 at 07:32:11 (UTC).

JORDAN MARIA NOBLE VS GERRY NOEL ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 JORDAN MARIA NOBLE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GERRY NOEL. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noble, Jordan Maria

Defendants

Noel, Gerry

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge J Garcia

 

Court Documents

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/29/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Response to Request for Admissions

04/27/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Motion

04/14/2023 - Response to Motion

Service Returned

04/13/2023 - Service Returned

Notice of Hearing-

04/12/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Request for Admissions

04/12/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

04/12/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/12/2023 - Request for Production

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

04/11/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Motion to Dismiss

04/06/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Limited Appearance

04/06/2023 - Notice of Limited Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

04/05/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Service Returned

04/04/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

04/03/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

03/30/2023 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: WEDNESDAY, JUNE 21, 2023 AT 9:30 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180202AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JORGE J GARCIA2800 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 800CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6913COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less