This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/10/2023 at 05:40:39 (UTC).

JORDAN MARIA NOBLE VS GERRY NOEL ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 JORDAN MARIA NOBLE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GERRY NOEL. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noble, Jordan Maria

Defendants

Noel, Gerry

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge J Garcia

 

Court Documents

Objection:

06/19/2023 - Objection:

Request:

06/16/2023 - Request:

Notice of Taking Deposition

06/16/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/30/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

05/25/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/29/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Response to Request for Admissions

04/27/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Motion

04/14/2023 - Response to Motion

Service Returned

04/13/2023 - Service Returned

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Production

02/23/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/23/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

02/23/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/23/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/23/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

02/23/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

02/23/2023 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/23/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Objection:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION ETC....

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR EXAMINATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: WEDNESDAY, JUNE 21, 2023 AT 9:30 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180202AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JORGE J GARCIA2800 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 800CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6913COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less