This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/11/2022 at 21:06:29 (UTC).

JONATHAN STRAUSS ET AL VS SKY GROUP USA LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 JONATHAN STRAUSS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SKY GROUP USA LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STRAUSS, JONATHAN

KASSIN, DANIELLA

Defendants

SKY CASH USA

SKY GROUP USA LLC

BETANCOURT, EFRAIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert C Solomon Esq

Defendant Attorneys

Sickles, Robert Eric

Gaset, John

 

Court Documents

Case Management Report

01/26/2022 - Case Management Report

Order to File

01/12/2022 - Order to File

Notice of Appearance

12/27/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record

12/02/2021 - Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record

Amended Notice of Hearing

11/12/2021 - Amended Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

11/02/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Withdraw

10/29/2021 - Motion to Withdraw

Motion for Extension of Time

06/09/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Stay

06/09/2021 - Motion to Stay

Motion for Extension of Time

05/25/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

05/13/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Copy of:

05/10/2021 - Copy of:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/29/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/29/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/28/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/28/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Email Notice:

04/13/2021 - Email Notice:

Complaint

04/13/2021 - Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Report; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to File; Event Type: Event; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: HEARING SET FOR 11/16/21 AT 8:30 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: HEARING SET FOR 11/16/21 AT 8:30 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Withdraw; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SKY GROUP USA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BETANCOURT EFRAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640223AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:ROBERT C SOLOMON ESQ150 N UNIVERSITY DR STE 200PLANTATION FL 33324-2008COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:04/29/2021REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640033AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ROBERT C SOLOMON ESQ150 N UNIVERSITY DR STE 200PLANTATION FL 33324-2008COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:04/15/2021REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SABAN@SSLEGALFIRM.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sky Group USA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gaset, John

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT E SICKLES