This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/21/2021 at 19:03:24 (UTC).

JOHN RUIZ VS AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 JOHN RUIZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AVATAR PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUIZ, JOHN

Defendant

AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Williams, Stephanie Puente

Defendant Attorney

Scolaro, Timothy Robert

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/21/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/21/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/25/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/27/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

01/31/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Amended Complaint

02/08/2021 - Amended Complaint

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/17/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Amended Notice

03/11/2021 - Amended Notice

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

07/13/2021 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Notice of Filing:

07/18/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Request for Production

07/18/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

08/13/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

08/13/2021 - Request for Production

Motion for Extension of Time

09/07/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S DISCOVERY Parties: RUIZ JOHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS: ESERVICE@AVATARINS.COM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Scolaro Timothy Robert; AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580112AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WILLIAMS, STEPHANIE PUENTE SPW LAW FIRM 8950 SW 74TH COURT SUITE 2201 MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/26/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590049AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:WILLIAMS, STEPHANIE PUENTE SPW LAW FIRM 8950 SW 74TH COURT SUITE 2201 MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/23/2021 REGISTER#:259CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less