This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/26/2021 at 22:21:45 (UTC).

JOHN ABELL CORPORATION VS 1414 WEST AVENUE, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 JOHN ABELL CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against 1414 WEST AVENUE, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN ABELL CORPORATION

Defendants

1414 WEST AVENUE, LLC

HON INVESTMENT, CORP

CENTURY BUILDERS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Conkey, Megan H.

 

Court Documents

Lis Pendens

02/12/2021 - Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/12/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Lis Pendens

02/12/2021 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

02/12/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/23/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/23/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/23/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/26/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/26/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/26/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: 1414 WEST AVENUE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: HON INVESTMENT CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CENTURY BUILDERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2540241AMT PAID:$30.00 NAME:ANNESSER, JOHN ANNESSER & CHAIKEN, PLLC 2525 PONCE DE LEON BLVD S CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/25/2021 REGISTER#:254CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570133AMT PAID:$410.00 NAME:CONKEY, MEGAN H. 2525 PONCE DE LEON BLVD. SUITE 625 CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$410.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/13/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32351:1477; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HON INVESTMENT, CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where 1414 WEST AVENUE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURY BUILDERS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where John Abell Corporation is a litigant