This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/02/2021 at 00:39:46 (UTC).

JOCELYN CEDENO VS GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC & BEAUTY INSTITUTE, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 JOCELYN CEDENO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC BEAUTY INSTITUTE, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedeno, Jocelyn

Defendant

GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC & BEAUTY INSTITUTE, INC.

 

Court Documents

Order Vacating Order of Dismissal

09/17/2020 - Order Vacating Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

07/06/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Order Vacating Order of Dismissal

09/17/2020 - Order Vacating Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

07/06/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Statement of Claim

06/10/2020 - Statement of Claim

Affidavit of Indigency

06/10/2020 - Affidavit of Indigency

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/10/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Vacating Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 32105:4167; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31999:1293; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC & BEAUTY INSTITUTE INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630001AMT PAID:$300.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/19/2020 REGISTER#:263CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indigency; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLEASE DISREGARD, APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION IS NOT FULLY COMPLETED #2,3,4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLEASE DISREGARD, APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION IS NOT FULLY COMPLETED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLEASE DISREGARD, APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION IS NOT FULLY COMPLETED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC AND BEAUTY INSTITUTE INC is a litigant