This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/29/2022 at 04:47:33 (UTC).

JM.JZ ENTERPRISES, INC. VS SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 JM JZ ENTERPRISES, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JM.JZ ENTERPRISES, INC.

Coastal Health Group

Assignor

Johnson, Raimon

Defendant

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greene, Travis

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/12/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/12/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/01/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

06/16/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/24/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150205AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/07/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080059AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:04/14/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JM.JZ ENTERPRISES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTAL HEALTH GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Security National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greene, Travis