This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 09:50:25 (UTC).

JM.JZ ENTERPRISES, INC. VS PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 JM JZ ENTERPRISES, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JM.JZ ENTERPRISES, INC.

d/b/a Coastal Health Group

Assignor

Carey, Leonard

Defendant

Progressive Express Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/21/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/21/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/26/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Progressive Express Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130316AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/26/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080100AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:04/23/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JM.JZ ENTERPRISES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where d/b/a SILVERMAN CHIROPRACTIC OF HIALEAH is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Express Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.