This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/08/2022 at 01:33:46 (UTC).

JM.JZ ENTERPRISES, INC. VS LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 JM JZ ENTERPRISES, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JM.JZ ENTERPRISES, INC.

Coastal Health Group

Defendants and Assignees

Lacroix, Marie

LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greene, Travis

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/03/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/03/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/20/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/22/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

07/12/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Order:

07/20/2022 - Order:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

07/21/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Voluntary Dismissal

08/02/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33319:297; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE Parties: LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CORRECTING CASE STYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220150AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/22/2022REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190174AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/04/2022REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JM.JZ ENTERPRISES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LM General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greene, Travis