This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/06/2021 at 09:21:00 (UTC).

JMJ FAMILY REAL ESTATE CORP VS ARMANDO CARDELLA, AS TRUSTEE OF THE BOSCH TRUST,

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 JMJ FAMILY REAL ESTATE CORP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ARMANDO CARDELLA, AS TRUSTEE OF THE BOSCH TRUST. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JMJ FAMILY REAL ESTATE CORP

Defendants

ARMANDO CARDELLA, AS TRUSTEE OF THE BOSCH TRUST,

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE,

MERS

MORTGAGEIT, INC.

ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE, INC,

CITY OF MIAMI

MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

MORTGAGEIT, INC

HSBC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Griffith, Derek Richard

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/01/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Lis Pendens

11/02/2021 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

11/01/2021 - Complaint

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/04/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/04/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/04/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/04/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/04/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/04/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/04/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010077AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GRIFFITH, DEREK RICHARD 18001 OLD CUTLER ROAD SUITE 352 PALMETTO BAY FL 33157-6433 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/05/2021 REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13. Parties: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: MORTGAGEIT INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: MERS

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040024AMT PAID:$413.50 NAME:GRIFFITH, DEREK RICHARD 18001 OLD CUTLER ROAD SUITE 352 PALMETTO BAY FL 33157-6433 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$7.50$7.50 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$413.50 RECEIPT DATE:11/03/2021 REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32829:2476; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORTGAGEIT INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Miami Dade County Fire Rescue is a litigant

Latest cases where Atlantic Credit & Fin Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC USA, N.A. is a litigant