This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 11:07:28 (UTC).

JM JZ ENTERPRISES INC VS SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 JM JZ ENTERPRISES INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JM JZ ENTERPRISES INC

COASTAL HEALTH GROUP

Assignor

WATERS, TONYA

Defendant

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greene, Travis

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/27/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/27/2021 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/10/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/14/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040246AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/11/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2960160AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:GREENE, TRAVIS300 SE 17TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33316-2550COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:12/28/2021REGISTER#:296CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JM.JZ ENTERPRISES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTAL HEALTH GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greene, Travis