Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/13/2021 at 06:49:51 (UTC).

JESUS S NEGRETTE ET AL VS AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 JESUS S NEGRETTE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEGRETTE, JESUS S

NEGRETTE, DIGNA

Defendant

AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Weir, Sylvia P, ESQ

Alonso, Alexander C

Defendant Attorney

Bustamante, Tiffany A

 

Court Documents

Motion for Relief from Judgment

06/04/2021 - Motion for Relief from Judgment

Notice of Production

06/04/2021 - Notice of Production

Notice of Taking Deposition

06/01/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

06/01/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion to Compel

05/27/2021 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

05/25/2021 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

05/24/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

05/18/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Hearing-

04/30/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Order Extending Time for

03/11/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

02/10/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

02/04/2021 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Admissions

02/02/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/02/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/02/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/01/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/16/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Email Notice:

12/04/2020 - Email Notice:

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Relief from Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2520085AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WEIR, SYLVIA P, ESQ THE WEIR LAW FIRM, P.A. 9990SW 77 AVE., SUITE 317 MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/15/2020 REGISTER#:252CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560166AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:WEIR, SYLVIA P, ESQ THE WEIR LAW FIRM, P.A. 9990SW 77 AVE., SUITE 317 MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/08/2020 REGISTER#:256CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRIMARY: SYLVIA.WEIR@THEWEIRLAWFIRM.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Club Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALONSO ALEXANDER C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEIR SYLVIA P