This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/25/2021 at 21:01:19 (UTC).

JEFFREY L. KATZELL, M.D., P.A. VS HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/29/2020 JEFFREY L KATZELL, M D , P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey L. Katzell, M.D., P.A.

Assignor

Welty, Antonio

Defendant

Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/29/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

03/29/2020 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

05/19/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Service of Process

07/21/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

07/29/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Interrogatory

08/04/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

08/04/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

08/04/2020 - Request for Admissions

Email Notice:

08/04/2020 - Email Notice:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/12/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Voluntary Dismissal

08/27/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32077:1248; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Caleb Courtroom 2-2 5400 N.W. 22nd Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2100046AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2380034AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JEFFREY L. KATZELL, M.D., P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.