This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/19/2019 at 12:13:08 (UTC).

JEAN, MARKENSON VS DANIEL, WENDIE

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 JEAN, MARKENSON filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against DANIEL, WENDIE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jean, Markenson

Respondent

Daniel, Wendie

Minor

Jean, Dianna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Clark, Sherline

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • Order Directing Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490031AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:CLARK, SHERLINE 111 NW 183RD ST STE 112 MIAMI GARDENS FL 33169-4520 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490016AMT PAID:$301.00 NAME:CLARK, SHERLINE 111 NW 183RD ST STE 112 MIAMI GARDENS FL 33169-4520 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$301.00$301.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Daniel Wendie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Application/ Aff for Determination of Civil Indigent Status; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Application for Determination of Indigent Status Approved; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Application/ Aff for Determination of Civil Indigent Status; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Parenting Plan; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Notice Designating Primary Email Address; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Affidavit of Petitioner - Child Custody Jurisdiction; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less