This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/25/2021 at 14:28:57 (UTC).

JANIKA BRYANT VS JOSE A MARTIN, D.O ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 JANIKA BRYANT filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JOSE A MARTIN, D O. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryant, Janika

Defendants

H Charles-Harris MD PA

Jose A Martin, D.O

Northshore Medical Center Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jablonski, Thomas E., ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

Midwall, Jonathan M

Kenneth W Morgan Jr

 

Court Documents

Order to File

10/20/2021 - Order to File

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

10/15/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice:

10/15/2021 - Notice:

Motion to Dismiss

10/06/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

10/06/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Hearing-

10/05/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Unavailability/absence

08/26/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Response to Request for Production

08/09/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Request for Copies

08/03/2021 - Request for Copies

Request for Production

08/03/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

08/03/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/26/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/26/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/26/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

07/26/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/16/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

07/16/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Request for Production

07/15/2021 - Request for Production

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to File; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF S AMENDED MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Northshore Medical Center Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Kenneth W Morgan Jr; Northshore Medical Center Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOVEMBER 3, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: H Charles-Harris MD PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Northshore Medical Center Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550010AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:JABLONSKI, THOMAS E., ESQ KLEIN GLASSER PARK & LOWE, P.L. 303 BANYAN BOULEVA WEST PALM BEACH FL 33401 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/20/2021 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Midwall, Jonathan M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan Jr, Kenneth W, ESQ.