This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 14:09:14 (UTC).

JANI MENDES VS C & W FACILITY SERVICES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 JANI MENDES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against C W FACILITY SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDES, JANI

Defendants

SERVICES INC, C & W FACILITY

COUNTY, MIAMI-DADE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonah M Wolfson

Defendant Attorney

Burns, Ryan David

 

Court Documents

Order Setting CM Deadline

05/09/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Response to Request for Production

04/26/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/26/2022 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion for Extension of Time

03/24/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

03/14/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

03/14/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Production

03/09/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

03/09/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer

03/09/2022 - Answer

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/05/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Production

01/04/2022 - Request for Production

Email Notice:

01/04/2022 - Email Notice:

Request for Copies

01/04/2022 - Request for Copies

Notice of Interrogatory

01/04/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

01/04/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/04/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: COUNTY MIAMI-DADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ESERVICE3@WOLFSONLAWFIRM.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where County, Miami-Dade is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNS RYAN D