This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/05/2021 at 02:29:20 (UTC).

JAFAR ENTERPRISES, LLC VS GONZALEZ, CARMELO A.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 JAFAR ENTERPRISES, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GONZALEZ, CARMELO A. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAFAR ENTERPRISES, LLC

Defendants

GONZALEZ, CARMELO A.

HOME EQUITY MORTGAGE CORPORTION

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Synchrony Bank/

PEPSI BEVERAGE COMPANY

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, as successor in interest to C

DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilkes, Alisa D

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment by Judge

09/15/2021 - Final Judgment by Judge

Motion for Default Judgment

09/09/2021 - Motion for Default Judgment

Order of Default

08/31/2021 - Order of Default

Default

08/13/2021 - Default

Service Returned

08/12/2021 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

08/12/2021 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

08/11/2021 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Motion:

08/09/2021 - Motion:

Non-Military Affidavit

08/09/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Lis Pendens

02/01/2021 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

01/28/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

01/28/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/28/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: QUIETING TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 32740:1140; Event Type: Event; Comments: QUIETING TITLE Parties: GONZALEZ CARMELO A.; DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVIC; PEPSI BEVERAGE COMPANY; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC as successor in interest to C; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC as successor in interest to C; CAVALRY SPV I LLC as assignee of Synchrony Bank/; HOME EQUITY MORTGAGE CORPORTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTED. Parties: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC as successor in interest to C; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC as successor in interest to C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GONZALEZ CARMELO A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GONZALEZ CARMELO A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GONZALEZ CARMELO A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32327:2709; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Home Equity Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where PEPSI BEVERAGES COMPANY DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant