This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/08/2023 at 17:41:09 (UTC).

IVAN D FLORES CASTILLO (CO PR) ET AL VS PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, (THE)

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 IVAN D FLORES CASTILLO CO PR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, THE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Flores Castillo (Co Pr), Ivan D

Obando (Co Pr), Katherine Tamara

Flores Obando (Estate of) (Dec, Keisha Fernanda

Defendants

Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, (The)

Jackson Memorial Hospital/Jackson Health System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russomanno, Christopher Salvatore

 

Court Documents

Notice:

04/20/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

04/17/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

04/14/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

04/14/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

04/13/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Mediation Conference

04/12/2023 - Notice of Mediation Conference

Notice of Mediation Conference

04/11/2023 - Notice of Mediation Conference

Order of Jury Trial Instruction

04/11/2023 - Order of Jury Trial Instruction

Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral

04/11/2023 - Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice:

01/27/2023 - Notice:

Motion to Strike

01/27/2023 - Motion to Strike

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/27/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

01/25/2023 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/25/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Mediation Conference; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Mediation Conference; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Jury Trial Instruction; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral; Event Type: Event; Comments: CALENDAR CALL SET FOR 9/28/23 AT 1:30 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Trial (case at Issue); Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO OPPOSING PARTY AS TO SERVICE OF PLEADINGS VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANTS' PLEADINGS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070112AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:RUSSOMANNO, CHRISTOPHER SALVATORE150 W FLAGLER ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33130-1560COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/27/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less