This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/07/2021 at 07:10:52 (UTC).

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS JUAN FRANCISCO GUILLEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUAN FRANCISCO GUILLEN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Infinity Insurance Company

Defendants

Guillen, Juan Francisco

Cutler Bay Fleet Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lord, Jared K, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

11/02/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Pre Trial Summons

11/02/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

10/11/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/11/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620024AMT PAID:$20.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/02/2021 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:MAYRAES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cutler Bay Fleet Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Guillen Juan Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110054AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:LORD, JARED K, ESQ 8400 NW 36 STREET, SUITE 250 MIAMI FL 33166 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/13/2021 REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 7400.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cutler Bay Fleet Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lord, Jared K, ESQ