This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/03/2023 at 08:17:37 (UTC).

INDEPENDENT IMAGING, L.L.C. VS CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 INDEPENDENT IMAGING, L L C filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INDEPENDENT IMAGING, L.L.C.

Assignor

Brown, Ismalie

Defendant

CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

Shelby L Cohen

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

10/19/2022 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

10/24/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/28/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/03/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

12/07/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190247AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/02/2022REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180102AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:10/22/2022REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where INDEPENDENT IMAGING, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shelby L Cohen