This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/06/2022 at 05:58:09 (UTC).

IN RE:ROBERSON, SAMUEL, JR.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 IN RE ROBERSON, SAMUEL, JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Duncan, Emma R

Decedent

Roberson, Samuel, Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

William S Frazier

 

Court Documents

Petition for Summary Administration

01/03/2022 - Petition for Summary Administration

Notice of Related Cases

01/03/2022 - Notice of Related Cases

Notice of Filing:

01/07/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Checklists and Certification

01/10/2022 - Checklists and Certification

Checklists and Certification

02/03/2022 - Checklists and Certification

Order of Summary Administration

02/09/2022 - Order of Summary Administration

Certified Copy Mailed

02/17/2022 - Certified Copy Mailed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certified Copy Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Summary Administration; Book/Page: 33016:3780; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Checklists and Certification; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Checklists and Certification; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010033AMT PAID:$346.00NAME:WILLIAM S FRAZIER1919 BLANDING BLVD STE 8JACKSONVILLE FL 32210-3254COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$346.00$346.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$346.00RECEIPT DATE:01/04/2022REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEATH CERT OF SAMUEL ROBERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEATH CERT OF LUCILLE ROBERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event; Comments: SAMUEL ROBERSON JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Summary Administration; Book/Page: 32949:1029; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frazier, William Stafford