This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/07/2019 at 06:03:04 (UTC).

IN RE:LOPEZ, RAUL I

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 IN RE LOPEZ, RAUL I was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Lopez, Juanita

Mendez, Elena

Decedent

Lopez, Raul I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kucaba, Janine N

 

Court Documents

Order of Summary Administration

06/10/2019 - Order of Summary Administration

Order Admitting Will to Probate

06/10/2019 - Order Admitting Will to Probate

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketWill; Event Type: Event; Comments: 9 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketSRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Summary Administration; Book/Page: 31477:4802; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Admitting Will to Probate; Book/Page: 31477:4807; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570042AMT PAID:$16.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3427-CLERK CERTIFICATE1$7.00$7.00 3420-COPY9$1.00$9.00 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$20.00 TENDER TYPE:CHANGETENDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2/22/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketPending Will; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketLetter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM: SUE WAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketDeath Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORIGINAL Parties: Lopez Raul I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520036AMT PAID:$346.00 NAME:KUCABA, JANINE N 2605 PONCE DE LEON BLVD MIAMI FL 33134-6002 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$346.00$346.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$346.00 R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketJoinder, Waiver And Consent; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM VIVIENNE L. PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketJoinder, Waiver And Consent; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM RAUL I. LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketJoinder, Waiver And Consent; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM LOURDES L. ZEYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketPetition for Summary Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketPetition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less