This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/12/2019 at 00:16:46 (UTC).

IN RE:KING, RUDOLPH S.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 IN RE KING, RUDOLPH S was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARVEY, ARIMENTHIA C.

Decedent

KING, RUDOLPH S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • Memorandum; Event Type: Event; Comments: FR/NSOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Order of Summary Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: CASTELLA KING, ORGNL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Memorandum; Event Type: Event; Comments: FR/N SOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150011AMT PAID:$346.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$346.00$346.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$346.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/30/2019 REGISTER#:315CASHIER:OHADDOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Unsigned Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: BLANK ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Affidavit of; Event Type: Event; Comments: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Copy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: LETTER FROM TALLAHASSEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Petition for Summary Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less