This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/02/2020 at 11:41:29 (UTC).

IN RE:KING, GLORIA ANNE

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 IN RE KING, GLORIA ANNE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

King, Rodney Lawrence

Decedent

King, Gloria Anne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sulzberger, Eric W.

 

Court Documents

Petition for Summary Administration

09/24/2020 - Petition for Summary Administration

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum; Event Type: Event; Comments: E W SULZBERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORNGL Parties: King Gloria Anne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2770048AMT PAID:$346.00 NAME:SULZBERGER, ERIC W. PO BOX 546644 BAY HARBOR ISLANDS FL 33154-06 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$346.00$346.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$346.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event; Comments: NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR : GLORIA ANNE KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Summary Administration; Book/Page: 32120:3972; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less