This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/09/2019 at 03:19:31 (UTC).

IN RE:IGLESIAS, JOSE M

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 IN RE IGLESIAS, JOSE M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TENZER-IGLESIAS, PENNY

Decedent

IGLESIAS, JOSE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Teichman Addicott, Sari

 

Court Documents

Will

04/05/2019 - Will

Order Admitting Will to Probate

03/29/2019 - Order Admitting Will to Probate

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • Certified Copy Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: 1 CC ORDER ADMITTING SELF PROVE D WILL TO ADDICOTT & ADDICOTT,P.A.,900 NORTH FEDERAL HIGHWAY,SUITE 201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Will; Book/Page: 31397:4212; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Certified Copy Request; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Order of Summary Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Admitting Will to Probate; Book/Page: 31384:4187; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF DISCLAIMING PROPERTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM: CASE MANAGER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORNGL Parties: IGLESIAS JOSE M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Unsigned Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER ADMITTING SELF PROVED WILL TO PROBATE AND OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF DISCLAIMING PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Petition for Summary Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less