This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/07/2019 at 06:02:28 (UTC).

IN RE:FIDUCIA, JEANETTE

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 IN RE FIDUCIA, JEANETTE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fiducia, Leonard

Decedent

Fiducia, Jeanette

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Andrew Babnik Jr., Esq.

 

Court Documents

Order of Summary Administration

05/27/2019 - Order of Summary Administration

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2019
  • SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Summary Administration; Book/Page: 31462:3106; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Memorandum; Event Type: Event; Comments: FR/H PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Affidavit for Atty Fee and Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Joinder, Waiver And Consent; Event Type: Event; Comments: ELSA VIOLET GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Joinder, Waiver And Consent; Event Type: Event; Comments: IGNAZIO SAL FIDUCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520025AMT PAID:$346.00 NAME:ANDREW BABNIK JR., ESQ. 75 VALENCIA AVE FL 4 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6141 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$346.00$346.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORNGL Parties: Fiducia Jeanette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Affidavit of; Event Type: Event; Comments: CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Verified Statement as to Creditors; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event; Comments: INTESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Petition for Summary Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less