This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/14/2019 at 09:28:11 (UTC).

IN RE:DAZA, MARIA OLGA

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 IN RE DAZA, MARIA OLGA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Esquivel, Ferdinan

Decedent

Daza, Maria Olga

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Terra Sickler Esq

 

Court Documents

Order Authorizing Sale of Real Property

02/05/2019 - Order Authorizing Sale of Real Property

Order of Summary Administration

02/05/2019 - Order of Summary Administration

Order Determining Homestead

02/05/2019 - Order Determining Homestead

Petition for Summary Administration

01/09/2019 - Petition for Summary Administration

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Authorizing Sale of Real Property; Book/Page: 31321:1516; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Summary Administration; Book/Page: 31321:1496; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Determining Homestead; Book/Page: 31321:1392; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: BY T L SICKLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORNGL Parties: Daza Maria Olga

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Petition for Order to Sell Real Prop; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3460005AMT PAID:$346.00 NAME:TERRA SICKLER ESQ PO BOX 2016 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33303-2016 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$346.00$346.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$346.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Affidavit of; Event Type: Event; Comments: CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Affidavit of; Event Type: Event; Comments: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event; Comments: BY A DISINTERESTED PERSON W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Petition for Det of Heirs/benef/homest; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Summary Administration; Book/Page: 31295:3641; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less