This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/02/2020 at 10:33:03 (UTC).

IN RE:CRAWLEY, STEVEN ROY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 IN RE CRAWLEY, STEVEN ROY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Crawley, Yen Hee

Decedent

Crawley, Steven Roy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Prieto, Brian L.

 

Court Documents

Petition for Summary Administration

09/24/2020 - Petition for Summary Administration

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: B L PRIETO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pending Will; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORGNL Parties: Crawley Steven Roy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2770026AMT PAID:$346.00 NAME:PRIETO, BRIAN L. COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$346.00$346.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$346.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/25/2020 REGISTER#:277

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Summary Administration; Book/Page: 32120:2218; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less