This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/10/2020 at 03:32:52 (UTC).

IN RE:ALDRIDGE, BERLINE

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 IN RE ALDRIDGE, BERLINE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Aldridge, Belinda

Decedent

Aldridge, Berline

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brook, Justin G

 

Court Documents

Order of Summary Administration

04/21/2020 - Order of Summary Administration

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SRS Disposed by Judge (Case Status Closed); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Summary Administration; Book/Page: 31908:4148; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: R BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEATH CERTIFICATE OF DECEDENT'S SON (PRE PREDECEASED DECEDENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORIGINAL Parties: Aldridge Berline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450025AMT PAID:$346.00 NAME:BROOK, JUSTIN G 1175 NE 125TH ST STE 512 NORTH MIAMI FL 33161-5012 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$346.00$346.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Paid Funeral Bill; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR : SYLVESTER ALDRIDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR: BERLINE ALDRIDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Summary Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.