This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/07/2019 at 04:37:51 (UTC).

IN RE: TYSZMAN, IGAL

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 IN RE TYSZMAN, IGAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Tyszman, Horacio

Tyszman, Silvia

Decedent

Tyszman, Igal

Not Classified By Court

FRENKEL, SHIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sloto, James Richard

 

Court Documents

Oath of Personal Representative

02/25/2019 - Oath of Personal Representative

Petition for Administration

02/01/2019 - Petition for Administration

Oath of Personal Representative

01/04/2019 - Oath of Personal Representative

Oath of Personal Representative

01/04/2019 - Oath of Personal Representative

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • Petition for Discharge; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Inventory Filed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Order of Distribution; Event Type: Event; Comments: (AGREED/ FINAL).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Statement Regarding Creditors; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event; Comments: (AGREED) FOR ORDER AMENDING ORDER APPROVING NET ACCUMULATIONS DUE ESTATE ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: SPECIAL SETTHURSDAY, JULY 11, 2019 AT 10:45 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: AGREED ORDER ON PETITION TO APPROVE NET ACCUMULATIONS DUE ESTATE FROM SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM: CASE MANAGER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 11, 2019 AT 10:45 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • Copy of; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEATH CERTIFICATE & CONSULAR MORTUARY CERTIFICATE(HONDURAS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3430002AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:SLOTO, JAMES RICHARD 9100 S DADELAND BLVD STE 1607 MIAMI FL 33156-7817 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Personal Representative; Book/Page: 31288:987; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT (SILVIA TYSZMAN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Personal Representative; Book/Page: 31288:984; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND DESIGNATON AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT (HORACIO TYSZMAN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Petition for Order Designating Depository; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Petition for Ancillary Adm.; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Hearing Info: Special Appointment; Hearing Code: SPECAPPT; Hearing Time: 10:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less