This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/02/2020 at 10:35:53 (UTC).

IN RE: TRIEF, MARVIN

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 IN RE TRIEF, MARVIN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Trief, Gary

Interested Party

Trief, Andrew

Decedent

Trief, Marvin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gonas, Sam

 

Court Documents

Oath of Personal Representative

09/25/2020 - Oath of Personal Representative

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event; Comments: ROBERTA HARRIET TRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM ATTORNEY SAM GONAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pending Will; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Oath of Personal Representative; Book/Page: 32122:1469; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Administration; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event; Comments: NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2770020AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:GONAS, SAM 2655 LE JEUNE RD STE 805-3 CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Waiver of Priority & Consent to Appointment of Personal Rep; Event Type: Event; Comments: SIGNED BY : ANDREW TRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Administration; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR : MARVIN THEIF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less