This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/12/2020 at 08:20:43 (UTC).

IN RE: STILL, DOROTHY ANN

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 IN RE STILL, DOROTHY ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Still, Richard A, Sr

Decedent

Still, Dorothy Ann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Charles Ian Nash

 

Court Documents

Petition for Administration

07/02/2020 - Petition for Administration

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Joinder, Waiver And Consent; Event Type: Event; Comments: K MAGUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: CH I NASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORNGL Parties: Still Dorothy Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600013AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:CHARLES IAN NASH 440 S BABCOCK ST MELBOURNE FL 32901-1276 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3400-PROBATE CP FILING1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Oath of Personal Representative; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Order Designating Depository; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Administration; Book/Page: 31996:4136; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less