This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/06/2023 at 16:20:54 (UTC).

IN RE: SOSA, J. ROGER

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 IN RE SOSA, J ROGER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-02

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bank of America, N.A.

Decedent

Sosa, J. Roger

Not Classified By Court

AMERICA, BANK OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sacher, Charles S

 

Court Documents

Will

12/15/2022 - Will

Proof of Publication

12/21/2022 - Proof of Publication

Certified Copy Mailed

12/20/2022 - Certified Copy Mailed

Codicil

12/15/2022 - Codicil

Codicil

12/15/2022 - Codicil

Certified Copy Mailed

12/14/2022 - Certified Copy Mailed

Order Designating Depository

12/08/2022 - Order Designating Depository

Letters of Administration

12/08/2022 - Letters of Administration

Order Admitting Will to Probate

12/08/2022 - Order Admitting Will to Probate

Order Admitting Will to Probate

12/08/2022 - Order Admitting Will to Probate

Checklists and Certification

12/07/2022 - Checklists and Certification

Certificate

12/06/2022 - Certificate

Oath of Witness to Will or Codicil

12/06/2022 - Oath of Witness to Will or Codicil

Pending Codicil

12/06/2022 - Pending Codicil

Pending Codicil

12/06/2022 - Pending Codicil

Pending Will

12/06/2022 - Pending Will

Letter of Correspondence

11/21/2022 - Letter of Correspondence

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12/14/202212/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt of Depository; Event Type: Event; Comments: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acceptance; Event Type: Event; Comments: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certified Copy Mailed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Codicil; Event Type: Event; Comments: SECOND (2 PGS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Codicil; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2 PGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Will; Book/Page: 33506:711; Event Type: Event; Comments: 10 PGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certified Copy Mailed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Designating Depository; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letters of Administration; Book/Page: 33496:4417; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Heirs; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Death Certificate - Copy; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR JOSE ROGER SOSA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event; Comments: APPT COMMISSIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event; Comments: NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Oath of Personal Representative; Book/Page: 33472:3406; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Order Designating Depository; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Administration; Book/Page: 33472:3426; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sacher, Charles S